VA SB817 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0960)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0960)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nuclear energy; considered a clean energy source. Provides that for the purposes of the Commonwealth Energy Policy, in any clean energy initiative or carbon-free energy initiative undertaken, overseen, regulated, or permitted by the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy, nuclear energy shall be considered to be a clean energy source.
Title
Nuclear energy; considered a clean energy source.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0960) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 960 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB817ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 35-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House (65-Y 35-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (14-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105123D |