VA SB818 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1096)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1096)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health dockets; established. Establishes, by the Behavioral Health Docket Act (the Act), behavioral health courts as specialized court dockets within the existing structure of Virginia's court system, offering judicial monitoring of intensive treatment and supervision of offenders who have mental illness and co-occurring substance abuse issues. The bill establishes a state behavioral health docket advisory committee and requires localities intending to establish such dockets to establish local behavioral health docket advisory committees. The bill gives the Supreme Court of Virginia administrative oversight of the implementation of the Act, which is modeled on the Drug Treatment Court Act (§ 18.2-254.1).
Title
Behavioral health dockets; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1096) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1096 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB818ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109684D-S2 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-03 | House | Delegates: Hope, Mullin, Campbell, J.L. |
2020-03-03 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Morrissey, Deeds, Norment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House insisted on substitute with amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendment (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute with amendment SB818H2 |
2020-02-24 | House | Amendment by Delegate Orrock agreed to |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-24 | House | Substitute by Delegate Rasoul agreed to 20108918D-H2 |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee substitute rejected 20108513D-H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Floor substitute printed 20108918D-H2 (Rasoul) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108513D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee rejected |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20107782D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB818ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Edwards agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107782D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107782D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103858D |