VA SB827 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Courthouse and courtroom security; assessment. Increases from $10 to $20 the maximum amount a local governing body may assess against a convicted defendant as part of the costs in a criminal or traffic case in district or circuit court to fund courthouse and courtroom security.
Title
Courthouse and courtroom security; increases assessment to fund security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 2-N) (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18103979D |