VA SB832 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; covered substances. Adds controlled substances included in Schedule V for which a prescription is required and naloxone to the list of covered substances the dispensing of which must be reported to the Prescription Monitoring Program. This bill is identical to HB 1556.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; adds controlled substances included in Schedule V naloxone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB832ER) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House (95-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18101582D |