VA SB845 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; mold testing; parental notification. Requires each local school board to develop and implement a plan to test and, if necessary, a plan to remediate mold in public school buildings in accordance with guidance issued by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. The bill requires each local school board to (i) submit such testing plan and report the results of any test performed in accordance with such plan to the Department of Health and (ii) take all steps necessary to notify school staff and the parents of all enrolled students if testing results indicate the presence of mold in a public school building at or above the minimum level that raises a concern for the health of building occupants, as determined by the Department of Health. The bill has an effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
School buildings, public; mold testing, effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 780 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB845ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (92-Y 6-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendment (92-Y 6-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB845S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106552D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106552D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103494D |