VA SB854 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB854
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council created; report. Creates the Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council as an advisory council in the legislative branch of state government to encourage urban agriculture and contribute to building a local food economy. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2023.
Title
Virginia Urban Agriculture Advisory Council; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104214D |
Same As/Similar To
SB854 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)