VA SB863 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB863
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disposition of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute. Authorizes the Governor to lease a portion of property previously used by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services as the Southwestern Virginia Mental Health Institute to Smyth County for a term of three years. The bill also corrects tax map references contained in Chapter 678 of the Acts of Assembly of 2019, which also involved conveyances of property in Smyth County.
Title
Southwestern Va. Mental Health Institute; Governor to lease a portion of property to Smyth County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104721D |
Same As/Similar To
SB863 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)