VA SB868 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1140)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited discrimination; public accommodations, employment, credit, and housing: causes of action; sexual orientation and gender identity. Creates causes of action for unlawful discrimination in public accommodations and employment in the Virginia Human Rights Act. Currently, under the Act there is no cause of action for discrimination in public accommodations, and the only causes of action for discrimination in employment are for (i) unlawful discharge on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, or childbirth or related medical conditions including lactation by employers employing more than five but fewer than 15 persons and (ii) unlawful discharge on the basis of age by employers employing more than five but fewer than 20 persons. The bill allows the causes of action to be pursued privately by the aggrieved person or, in certain circumstances, by the Attorney General. Before a civil cause of action may be brought in a court of the Commonwealth, an aggrieved individual must file a complaint with the Division of Human Rights of the Department of Law, participate in an administrative process, and receive a notice of his right to commence a civil action. The bill prohibits discrimination in public and private employment on the basis of sexual orientation and gender identity. The bill also codifies for state and local government employment the current prohibitions on discrimination in employment on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, or status as a veteran. Additionally, the bill (a) prohibits discrimination in public accommodations on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, or status as a veteran; (b) prohibits discrimination in credit on the basis of sexual orientation, gender identity, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, disability, and status as a veteran; and (c) adds discrimination on the basis of an individual's sexual orientation, gender identity, or status as a veteran as an unlawful housing practice. The bill makes technical amendments.
Title
Discrimination; prohibited in public accommodations, etc., causes of action, civil actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #5 by Senator Peake rejected (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendments #'s 1,2,3,4,6,7,8 by Senator Peake rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Pass By (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #5 by Senator Peake rejected (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Amendments #'s 1,2,3,4,6,7,8 by Senator Peake rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1140) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1140 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB868ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 20108819D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB868H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Pass By (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Motion to pass by amendment by Delegate LaRock agreed to (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-24 | House | Substitute by Delegate Sickles agreed to 20108819D-H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Floor substitute printed 20108819D-H1 (Sickles) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-19 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB868S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #9 by Senator Peake rejected |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Amendment #5 by Senator Peake rejected (17-Y 23-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Amendments #'s 1,2,3,4,6,7,8 by Senator Peake rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107133D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB159 (Boysko) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB66 (McClellan) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107133D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104737D |
Same As/Similar To
SB66 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
SB159 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
SB159 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 853 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 854 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 965 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |