VA SB875 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Board of Social Services; regulations related to staffing of assisted living facilities providing care for adults with serious cognitive impairments. Directs the State Board of Social Services to amend regulations governing staffing of assisted living facilities that provide care for adults with serious cognitive impairments who cannot recognize danger or protect their own safety and welfare to allow an exception to certain requirements for assisted living facilities that are licensed for 10 or fewer residents if no more than three of the residents have serious cognitive impairments. The bill also directs the Board of Social Services to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill within 280 days and prohibits the Board of Social Services from enforcing the provisions of 22VAC40-73-1020, as it shall become effective, in cases involving assisted living facilities that are licensed for 10 or fewer residents if no more than three of the residents have serious cognitive impairments. The bill contains an emergency clause and is identical to HB 1439.
Title
Assisted living facilities; regulations governing staff.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 686 (effective 3/30/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB875ER) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2018-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18104729D-E |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB875E |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18104729D |