VA SB881 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historical African American Cemeteries and Graves Fund. Creates the Historical African American Cemeteries and Graves Fund and provides that any funds that are appropriated to the Department of Historic Resources but not used for the maintenance of graves, in particular the listed historical African American cemeteries, shall be deposited in the Fund. The bill authorizes the Director of the Department to manage and administer the Fund and to disburse moneys in the Fund to maintain additional graves that have been certified by the Department and documented in the Department's cultural resources database.
Title
Historical African American Cemeteries and Graves Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB881ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 20108519D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB881H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108519D-H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108519D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102885D-E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB881E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102885D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2211.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |