VA SB897 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0155)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0155)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; governing boards; educational programs. Requires all members of governing boards of public institutions of higher education to participate in educational programs designed to address the role, duties, and responsibilities of the governing boards at least once within the first two years of membership and at least once within every two years of membership thereafter. Under current law, new members are required to participate in such programs at least once during their first two years of membership. The bill directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to develop educational materials for board members with more than two years of service on a governing board and develop criteria by which such members shall demonstrate compliance.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; governing boards, educational programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0155) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 155 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 6, 2020 | |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB897ER) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-17 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB897S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106653D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106653D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103229D |