VA SB9 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Adds cancers of the colon, brain, or testes to the list of cancers that are presumed to be an occupational disease covered by the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act when firefighters or certain employees develop the cancer. The presumption shall not apply for any individual who was diagnosed with one of the conditions before July 1, 2020. The measure removes the compensability requirement that the employee who develops cancer had contact with a toxic substance encountered in the line of duty. The bill also reduces the number of years of service needed to qualify for the presumption from 12 to five for various types of cancer. For hypertension or heart disease, the bill adds a requirement that an individual complete five years of service in his position in order to qualify.
Title
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases, conditions before 7/1/20.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute agreed to (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB9ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB9S2 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Title replaced 20107320D-S2 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to (28-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20105713D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107320D-S2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105713D-S1 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Incorporates SB531 (Vogel) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Incorporates SB381 (McPike) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Incorporates SB58 (Cosgrove) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100504D |
Same As/Similar To
HB783 (Same As) 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0498)
SB58 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
SB381 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
SB531 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
SB58 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
SB381 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor
SB531 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Incorporated by Commerce and Labor