VA SB907 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation safety. Requires all passengers in a vehicle to wear safety belts and allows localities to lower the speed limit below 25, but not less than 15, miles per hour in business and residential districts.
Title
Transportation safety; occupants of motor vehicles not equipped with seat belts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (11-Y 28-N) (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 44-N) (Y: 49 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 44-N) (Y: 49 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | No further action taken |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report rejected by Senate (11-Y 28-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (49-Y 44-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (49-Y 44-N) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20109779D-S2 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-27 | House | Delegates: McQuinn, Jones, Knight |
2020-02-27 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Marsden, Suetterlein |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 48-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House with substitute (52-Y 48-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB907H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108656D-H1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108656D-H1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N 1-A) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB907S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108056D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108056D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB370 (Bell) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB276 (Barker) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104138D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.48:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 323.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 1 | 882.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1005.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1005.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1025 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1043 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1048 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1053 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1060.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1065 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1072.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1078.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1092 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1094 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1157 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1158 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1158.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1158.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1158.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1159 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1161.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1163 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1164 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1165 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1168 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1171 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1172 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1173 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1175.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1176 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1190.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1531 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1539 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1539.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2000.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 602.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 694.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 730.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 882 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 947 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |