VA SB909 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Lottery Board; regulation of the manufacturing, distributing, owning, hosting, and playing of electronic gaming devices; penalties. Authorizes the manufacture, distribution, owning, hosting, and playing of electronic gaming devices in the Commonwealth, to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery Board. The bill specifies the licensing requirements for the manufacture, distribution, owning, and hosting of electronic gaming devices and imposes criminal and civil penalties for violations of the law and regulations related to electronic gaming devices. The bill directs the Board to establish a maximum combined number of electronic gaming devices that may be hosted at host locations throughout the Commonwealth. The bill prohibits any host location from being located within a one-mile radius of any lottery sales agent and prohibits any host location licensee from offering more than nine electronic gaming devices to the public for play at such host location's establishment. The bill imposes a 12 percent tax on all gross profits from the play of electronic gaming devices and provides for how the tax proceeds are disbursed. The bill also establishes the Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund, administered by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to provide counseling and other support services for compulsive and problem gamblers, develop problem gambling treatment and prevention programs, and provide grants to support organizations that provide assistance to compulsive gamblers.
Title
Virginia Lottery Board; regulation of manufacturing, distributing, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by General Laws and Technology (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Incorporated by General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20101806D |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Similar To) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1277)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 334.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4027 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4056 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |