VA SB918 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp extract; approval as food or ingredient; regulations; fund; emergency. Provides that an industrial hemp extract, as defined in the bill, is a food and is subject to applicable laws and regulations. The bill establishes (i) requirements for the production of an industrial hemp extract or a food containing an extract and (ii) conditions under which a manufacturer of such extract or food shall be considered an approved source. The bill authorizes the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations establishing contaminant tolerances, labeling requirements, and batch testing requirements, and it provides that moneys collected under the chapter shall be deposited in the Virginia Industrial Hemp Fund, created by the bill. The bill directs the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry to report by November 1, 2020, a plan for the long-term sustainability of funding for the industrial hemp program.
Title
Industrial hemp extract; approval as food or ingredient, regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 4/6/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB918ER) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Passed House with amendment (98-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20106363D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB918ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106363D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Incorporates SB827 (Ruff) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106363D-S1 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Hemp |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 20102700D |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20102700D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1430 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0659)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 4121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 5145.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |