VA SB922 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Lottery; Internet sales. Repeals the prohibition on selling lottery tickets over the Internet.
Title
Virginia Lottery; Internet sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0117) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 117 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB922ER) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Passage (73-Y 26-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House (73-Y 26-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB922S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106706D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106706D-S1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Incorporates SB959 (Barker) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104700D |
Same As/Similar To
SB959 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |