VA SB931 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax subtraction; crime stopper rewards. Increases from $1,000 to $5,000, beginning in taxable year 2020, the maximum amount that may be subtracted from taxable income for amounts received as a reward for providing information to a law-enforcement official or agency, or to a nonprofit corporation created exclusively to assist such law-enforcement official or agency, that is used in the apprehension and conviction of perpetrators of crimes.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for crime stopper rewards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB931ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendments (96-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104489D |
Same As/Similar To
HB307 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)