VA SB936 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Standards of Achievement Career and Technical Education Committee; established. Directs the Board of Education to establish the Standards of Achievement Career and Technical Education Committee (Committee) to make recommendations to the General Assembly and the Board of Education to facilitate the development of career and technical education Standards of Achievement, including accreditation standards, assessment testing, and course content and curriculum for participating schools, with a focus on (i) rigorous standards and course content and curriculum that align workforce skills with industry-recognized standards; (ii) robust business and industry engagement and responsiveness to labor market needs; (iii) strategies to remove the stigma from career and technical education, including early exposure to career options and life skills; (iv) work-based learning and apprenticeships; (v) innovative high school models; and (vi) leveraging existing resources and programs in the Commonwealth. The Committee shall identify any necessary changes to statutory and regulatory provisions, including existing requirements regarding (a) instructional programs; (b) instructional, administrative, and, support personnel; (c) accreditation; (d) assessments; (e) graduation requirements; (f) teacher licensure; and (g) dual enrollment. The bill requires the Committee to report its findings and recommendation to the General Assembly and the Board of Education by November 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of Achievement Career and Technical Education Committee; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Education and Health
2018-02-08SenateContinued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-01-19SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 18105083D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:11(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback