VA SB954 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish and administer the Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program (the Program). The bill provides that any dairy farmer that has a resource management plan or nutrient management plan and participates in the federal margin coverage program for dairy producers as contained in the federal Agriculture Improvement Act of 2018 is eligible to participate in the Program. Under the bill, each year a Program participant will receive a refund of its annual premium payment paid into the federal program. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108669D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105430D-E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB954E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105430D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 3304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |