VA SB960 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Lottery Board; regulation of the manufacturing, distributing, operating, hosting, and playing of dominant skill video games; penalties. Authorizes the manufacture, distribution, operation, hosting, and playing of dominant skill video games, defined in the bill, in the Commonwealth, to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery Board. The bill specifies the licensing requirements for the manufacture, distribution, operation, and hosting of dominant skill video games and imposes criminal and civil penalties for violations of the law and regulations related to dominant skill video games. The bill imposes a 20 percent tax on all gross profits generated from the play of dominant skill video games and the sale of fills, defined in the bill, by distributor licensees to operator licensees and provides for how the tax proceeds are disbursed. The bill also establishes the Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund, administered by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to provide counseling and other support services for compulsive and problem gamblers, develop problem gambling treatment and prevention programs, and provide grants to support organizations that provide assistance to compulsive gamblers.
Title
Va. Lottery Board; regulation of the manufacturing, distributing, etc., video games.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104736D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 334.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4027 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4056 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |