VA SB961 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Hopewell. Exempts from a referendum requirement bonds issued for the construction, improvement, expansion, or replacement of existing public buildings or facilities, and authorizes the City of Hopewell to replace existing buildings or facilities on an alternative site.
Title
Hopewell, City of; amending charter, issuance of bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB961ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104502D-E |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB961E |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (12-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104502D |