VA SB964 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0885)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0885)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marine Resources Commission; Virginia Institute of Marine Science; coastal resource management. Requires the Marine Resources Commission to establish and implement a general permit regulation that authorizes and encourages the use of living shorelines as the preferred alternative for stabilizing tidal shorelines. The Commission, in cooperation with the Department of Conservation and Recreation and with technical assistance from the Virginia Institute of Marine Science (VIMS), shall also develop integrated guidance for the management of tidal shoreline systems for the regulatory entities with authority over shoreline management projects. VIMS shall also develop comprehensive coastal resource management guidance for local governments. Those localities in Tidewater Virginia must incorporate such guidance at the next scheduled review of their comprehensive plan.
Title
Coastal resource management; Marine Resources Commission, et al., to develop integrated guidance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0885) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 885 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (17-Y 23-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB964ER) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102534D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2223.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |