VA SB965 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; collection and use of personal information by law-enforcement agencies. Provides that, unless a criminal or administrative warrant has been issued, law-enforcement and regulatory agencies shall not use surveillance technology to collect or maintain personal information where such data is of unknown relevance and is not intended for prompt evaluation and potential use regarding suspected criminal activity or terrorism by any individual or organization. The bill authorizes law-enforcement agencies to collect information from license plate readers, provided that such information is held for no more than seven days, and is not subject to any outside inquiries or internal usage, except in the investigation of a crime or missing persons report. After seven days, such collected information must be purged from the system unless it is being utilized in an ongoing investigation. The bill also adds to the definition of "personal information" vehicle license plate numbers and information that affords a basis for inferring an individual's presence at any place.
Title
Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; limitation on collection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB965ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105622D-S1 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-25 | House | Delegates: Anderson, Cline, Rasoul |
2015-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators:Petersen, Garrett, Stuart |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-20 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB965H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105094D-H1 |
2015-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105094D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (17-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103452D-E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB965E |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #1 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103452D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1673 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor