VA SB975 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; pilot program; feasibility Department of Education; pilot program; feasibility of educational placement transition of certain students with disabilities. Requires the Department of Education to develop and implement a pilot program in two local school divisions in the Commonwealth to partner with the appropriate school board employees in each such local school division to (i) identify the resources, services, and supports required by each student who resides in each such local school division and who is educated in a private school setting pursuant to his Individualized Education Program; (ii) study the feasibility of transitioning each such student from his private school setting to an appropriate public school setting in the local school division and providing the identified resources, services, and supports in such public school setting; and (iii) recommend a process for redirecting federal, state, and local funds, including funds provided pursuant to the Children's Services Act, provided for the education of each such student to the local school division for the purpose of providing the identified resources, services, and supports in the appropriate public school setting.
Title
Students with disabilities; feasibility of educational placement transition of certain students.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rereferred from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 18105622D |