VA SB981 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Professions and occupations; expediting the issuance of credentials to spouses of military service members. Provides for the expedited issuance of credentials to the spouses of military service members who are (i) ordered to federal active duty under Title 10 of the United States Code or (ii) veterans who have left active duty service within one year of the submission of an application to a board if the spouse accompanies the service member to the Commonwealth or an adjoining state or the District of Columbia. Under current law, the expedited review is provided more generally for active duty members of the military who are the subject of a military transfer to the Commonwealth. The bill also authorizes a regulatory board within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation or the Department of Health Professions or any other board in Title 54.1 (Professions and Occupations) to waive any requirement relating to experience if the board determines that the documentation provided by the applicant supports such waiver.
Title
Military service members and veterans; expediting the issuance of credentials to spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 35 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB981ER) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105605D-E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB981E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Suetterlein agreed to |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105605D |
Same As/Similar To
HB967 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)