VA SB991 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1079)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1079)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Social Services; Office of New Americans created. Establishes the Office of New Americans within the Department of Social Services and the Office of New Americans Advisory Board to assist with immigrant integration within the Commonwealth on an economic, social, and cultural level. The Office shall provide (i) advice and assistance regarding the citizenship application process; (ii) assistance with securing employment, housing, and services for which such persons may be eligible; (iii) information to localities and immigration service organizations about state programs that help such persons find and secure employment, housing, and services for which they may be eligible; and (iv) information to localities and immigration service organizations regarding health epidemics and unlawful predatory actions, such as human trafficking, gang recruitment, and fraudulent financial and other schemes, to which communities of such persons may be especially vulnerable. The Advisory Board shall report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly on the activities of the Office of New Americans and provide recommendations for improving state policies and programs to support the economic, linguistic, and civic integration of new Americans throughout the Commonwealth.
Title
New Americans, Office of; created within Department of Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1079) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1079 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB991ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendment (55-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20107299D-ES1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB991ES1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107299D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107299D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105427D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1209 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1078)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 209.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 209.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |