VA SB995 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; labor organizations. Repeals enactments adopted in 2018 as part of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (WMATA) funding bills related to bidders, offers, contractors, and subcontractors to WMATA projects located in the Commonwealth participating with labor organizations.
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; labor organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0282) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 282 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB995ER) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105402D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1635 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)