VA SB999 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local incentives for the design, development, or production of goods for national defense. Creates a separate classification of machinery and tools designed and used directly in manufacturing or processing materials, components, or equipment for national defense. Local governments would be authorized to tax such machinery and tools at a rate that is less than the rate generally applicable to machinery and tools. The bill also authorizes local governments to establish, by ordinance, local defense production zones including incentives and regulatory flexibility for the design, development, or production by a defense production business of materials, components, or equipment for national defense. This bill incorporates
Title
Local Defense Production Zone; created and creates a separate classification of machinery and tools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #1 agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #2, #3 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #1 agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (3-Y 37-N) (Y: 3 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #2, #3 (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0877) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 877 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB999ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation Amendments #2,3 (95-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (0-Y 40-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation #1 agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation #1 (3-Y 37-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #2, #3 (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB999ER) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB999S1 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104373D-S1 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Incorporates SB970 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104373D-S1 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103545D |
Same As/Similar To
SB970 (Similar To) 2011-01-19 - Senate: Incorporated by Finance (SB999-Stosch) (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3245.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3508.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3853 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |