VA SJR215 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ215ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ215ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Charles Calvin Singleton.
Title
Celebrating the life of Charles Calvin Singleton.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Benton Chafin [R] | Sen. Creigh Deeds [D] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. William Stanley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ215ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House |
2020-03-05 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2020-03-05 | House | Received |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Presented 20108833D |