VA SJR254 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ254ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ254ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Transportation; purchase of the Dulles Greenway; report. Requests the Department of Transportation to study the feasibility of purchasing all or part of the Dulles Greenway.
Title
Dulles Greenway; purchase of Greenway by VDOT.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 26-N 1-A) (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ254ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 26-N 1-A) |
2019-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House (73-Y 26-N 1-A) |
2019-02-20 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Rules (10-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19100620D-E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ254E |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100620D |