VA SJR278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); personal property tax exemption; motor vehicle of a veteran who is disabled. Provides that one motor vehicle of a veteran who has a 100 percent service-connected, permanent, and total disability shall be exempt from state and local taxes. The amendment provides that only automobiles and pickup trucks qualify for the exemption. Additionally, the exemption is only applicable on the date the motor vehicle is acquired or the effective date of the amendment, whichever is later, and is not applicable for any period of time prior to the effective date of the amendment.
Title
Constitutional amendment; personal property tax exemption for motor vehicle of a disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823) | |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/19) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ278ER) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (94-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-21 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Filler-Corn, Rush, O'Quinn |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, DeSteph, Spruill |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2019-02-20 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House with substitute (97-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SJ278H1 |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106687D-H1 |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106687D-H1 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ278S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105271D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105271D-S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19101842D |