VA SJR284 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Constitution of the United States; Equal Rights Amendment. Ratifies the Equal Rights Amendment to the Constitution of the United States that was proposed by Congress in 1972. The joint resolution advocates the position that the 1972 Equal Rights Amendment remains viable and may be ratified notwithstanding the expiration of the 10-year ratification period set out in the resolving clause, as amended, in the proposal adopted by Congress.
Title
United States Constitution; ratifies Equal Rights Amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ284S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104385D-S1 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Incorporates SJ270 (Saslaw) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104385D-S1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100228D |