VA SJR297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ297ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ297ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Acknowledging with profound regret the existence and acceptance of lynching within the Commonwealth. Expresses the sentiment of the General Assembly in acknowledging with profound regret the existence and acceptance of lynching within the Commonwealth and calling for reconciliation among all Virginians. This resolution is a recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission. This resolution is identical to HJ 655.
Title
Lynching; acknowledging with profound regret the existence and acceptance within the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ297ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ297S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106333D-S1 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106333D-S1 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103780D |