VA SJR308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ308ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ308ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Loudoun County Sheriff's Department.
Title
Commending the Loudoun County Sheriff's Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ308ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-01-18 | House | Received |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/09/19 19100326D |