VA SJR313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ313ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ313ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Commissioners of the Revenue Association of Virginia.
Title
Commending the Commissioners of the Revenue Association of Virginia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ313ER) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-01-18 | House | Received |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Presented 19104015D |