VA SJR331 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ331ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ331ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Frances Mae West Byers.
Title
Commending Frances Mae West Byers.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ331ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-08 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-02-08 | House | Received |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Presented 19104325D |