VA SJR397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ397ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ397ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Ashland D. Fortune.
Title
Commending Ashland D. Fortune.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. John Edwards [D] | Sen. Janet Howell [D] |
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ397ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-02-18 | House | Received |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Presented 19105850D |