VA SJR414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ414ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ414ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending The Apprentice School.
Title
Commending The Apprentice School.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Sen. Thomas Norment [R] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ414ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-02-18 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-02-18 | House | Received |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Presented 19106615D |