VA SJR418 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ418ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ418ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appointment by the Senate Committee on Rules. Confirms an appointment to the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council by the Senate Committee on Rules.
Title
Va. Conflict of Interest & Ethics Advisory Council; confirming appt. by Senate Committee on Rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ418ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Taken up |
2019-02-21 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19100122D |