VA SJR435 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ435ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ435ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Suzanne Curry McBride.
Title
Celebrating the life of Suzanne Curry McBride.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Richard Black [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Thomas Norment [R] |
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ435ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Agreed to by House |
2019-02-21 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2019-02-21 | House | Received |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Presented 19105278D |