VA SJR452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-23 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ452ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Food For Neighbors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Food For Neighbors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SJ452ER)
2019-02-22HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-02-21HouseLaid on Speaker's table
2019-02-21HouseReceived
2019-02-21SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate
2019-02-18SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-02-18SenatePresented 19106950D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback