VA SJR65 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER)
Summary
Study; Southeastern Public Service Authority; report. Directs the Auditor of Public Accounts to collect, receive, and analyze data and information relating to the operation and finances of the Southeastern Public Service Authority. The Auditor must submit his findings to the 2009 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Southeastern Public Service Authority; Auditor of Public Accounts to collect, receive, etc. data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Taken up | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-14 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ65S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 084244308-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 084244308-S1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081206308 |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Authorities
Southeastern Virginia
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Authorities
Southeastern Virginia
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ65 |