VA SJR65 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-14 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Youth Art Month. Designates March, in 2010 and in each succeeding year, as Youth Art Month in Virginia.
Title
Youth Art Month; designating as March 2010, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER) | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Taken up | |
2010-02-23 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103330D-E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ65E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103330D |