VA SJR65 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Rosa Ileana Johnson.
Title
Celebrating the life of Rosa Ileana Johnson.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ65ER) |
2016-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House |
2016-01-15 | House | Laid on Speaker's table |
2016-01-15 | House | Received |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and laid on Clerk's desk; offered 01/13/16 16103453D |