VT H0007 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to creating the Department of Liquor and Lottery and the Board of Liquor and Lottery
Title
An act relating to creating the Department of Liquor and Lottery and the Board of Liquor and Lottery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 19 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 4 (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2018 |
2018-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2018 |
2018-06-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 6/13/2018 |
2018-06-07 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 19 of 25 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 4 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed |
2018-05-30 | House | Read Third time |
2018-05-30 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-30 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2018-05-30 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |