VT H0073 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-15 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 15, 2019 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2019-04-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-03-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-01 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rep. Hooper of Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-01-24 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |