VT H0099 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to trade in covered animal parts or products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to trade in covered animal parts or products

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-08SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on October 8, 2020
2020-10-08HouseSigned by Governor on October 8, 2020
2020-10-02HouseDelivered to the Governor on October 2, 2020
2020-09-25HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2020-09-25SenateMotion agreed to
2020-09-25SenateSenator Sirotkin moved to order the bill delivered to the Governor, forthwith, pursuant to Joint Rule 15
2020-09-25SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2020-09-25SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-09-24SenateSenator Rodgers explained vote
2020-09-24SenateSenator Brock explained vote
2020-09-24Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5
2020-09-24SenateFloor amendment # by Senator Brock disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Failed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 10, Nays = 20
2020-09-24SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Failed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 6, Nays = 24
2020-09-24SenateMotion disagreed to
2020-09-24SenateSenator Rodgers moved to commit the bill to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-09-24SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock; text
2020-09-24SenateReported favorably by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-09-24SenateRead 2nd time
2020-09-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-09-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-09-23SenateFavorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-09-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-09-18HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-09-18HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester disagreed to
2020-09-17HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-09-17HouseReport of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife agreed to.
2020-09-17HouseRep. McCullough of Williston reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
2020-09-17HouseRead Second Time
2020-06-03HouseAction postponed until June 10, 2020 as moved by Rep. Sheldon of Middlebury
2020-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar for Notice on 3/13/2020
2019-01-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback