VT H0132 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to adopting protections against housing discrimination for victims of domestic and sexual violence
Title
An act relating to adopting protections against housing discrimination for victims of domestic and sexual violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 10, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 4, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town. |
2019-05-24 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Balint for Committee, text |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-14 | House | Speaker appointed Stevens of Waterbury, Szott of Barnard and Gamache of Swanton as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-13 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Balint, Sirotkin, and Clarkson |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sirotkin |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-10 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Szott of Barnard |
2019-05-07 | House | Action postponed until May 9 ,2019 as moved by Rep. Stevens of Waterbury |
2019-05-03 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sears motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2019-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Balint for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-20 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to. |
2019-03-20 | House | Rep. Szott of Barnard reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |