VT H0287 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to small probate estates
Title
An act relating to small probate estates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 22, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-13 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rep. Burditt of West Rutland reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |