VT H0351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to commit bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-07 - Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to commit bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to workers’ compensation, unemployment insurance, and ski tramway amendments
Title
An act relating to workers’ compensation, unemployment insurance, and ski tramway amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 8 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to commit bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was agreed to. |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 8 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senator(s) Sirotkin, Balint, Clarkson, and Hooker to substitute amendment agreed to |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Motion disagreed to |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senator Brock moved to postpone action for one legislative day |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Consideration interrupted by recess |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senator(s) Sirotkin, Balint, Clarkson, and Hooker motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senator McCormack requested & granted leave to withdraw Appropriations Committee recommendation of amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee on Finance relieved; bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator Cummings |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-03-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-20 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. |
2019-03-20 | House | Rep. Hill of Wolcott reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |